HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:16:29

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Qwikresponse against Brenda Brown in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2183
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Brown Brenda Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Qwikresponse
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Request for Court Order and Answer]
8/21/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
9/6/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/5/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/21/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT...
5/23/2017: Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMEN...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/23/2017
5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Court Order) of 09/05/2017 and Judgm...
9/5/2017: Minute Order (Court Order) of 09/05/2017 and Judgm...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/23/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 09/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 09/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/05/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 05/23/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - .
  • 09/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Qwikresponse against Defendant Brenda Brown on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Qwikresponse on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 for a total of $5,000.00.
  • 09/01/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Qwikresponse (Plaintiff)
  • 08/21/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Qwikresponse (Plaintiff)
  • 08/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/23/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 05/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Qwikresponse (Plaintiff)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Other - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: Qwikresponse (Plaintiff); Brenda Brown (Defendant)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/23/2017
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Qwikresponse (Plaintiff); As to: Brenda Brown (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/04/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Qwikresponse (Plaintiff); As to: Brenda Brown (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011516 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --