HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:16:39

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Rene Moya Jr - Junior against Letecia Pina in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2180
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Moya Rene Jr. - Junior
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Pina Letecia Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/23/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Rene Moya JR. - Junior against Defendant Letecia Pina on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rene Moya, JR. - Junior on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,615.00.
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/23/2017
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Rene Moya, JR. - Junior (Plaintiff); As to: Letecia Pina (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/09/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rene Moya, JR. - Junior (Plaintiff); As to: Letecia Pina (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011512 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --