HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:16:36

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Edgar Donado against Marisela Mendiolaleal in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2178
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Donado Edgar
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Mendiolaleal Marisela Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/20/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Receipt for Exhibits
7/14/2017: Receipt for Exhibits
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Other - (name extension) - Statement of Decision
5/31/2017: Other - (name extension) - Statement of Decision
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/31/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/31/2017
5/31/2017: Minute Order of 05/31/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
5/31/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/14/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/31/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 05/31/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/31/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/31/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/31/2017
  • Other - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/30/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Edgar Donado on 03/02/2017: Defendant Marisela Mendiolaleal does not owe the plaintiff Edgar Donado any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: The Court issues a Statement of Decision, a copy of which is mailed to each party. EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Edgar Donado (Plaintiff); As to: Marisela Mendiolaleal (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/21/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Edgar Donado (Plaintiff); As to: Marisela Mendiolaleal (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Edgar Donado (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Edgar Donado (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011508 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --