HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:16:06

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by City Of Long Beach against Matthew L Smith in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2174
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Maria May J. Santos
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    City Of Long Beach
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Smith Matthew L Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
4/11/2017: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
4/5/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/11/2017
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff)
  • 04/05/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew L Smith (Defendant); Costs: 65.00
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew L Smith (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: GOVT AGENCY (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: GOVT AGENCY (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --