HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:15:27

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Juan Carlos Palma against Neftali Molina in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2159
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Palma Juan Carlos
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Molina Neftali Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

orap
7/27/2017: orap
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Appli...
7/18/2017: [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Appl...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/1/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
7/13/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/22/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for...
8/24/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order fo...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application and Order to Produce Statement of Asse...
7/18/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Ass...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 08/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 08/24/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/24/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/24/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/27/2017
  • Subpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by: Juan Carlos Palma (Plaintiff); As to: Neftali Molina (Defendant)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) orap; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Neftali Molina (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 07/25/2017
  • 07/18/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Neftali Molina (Defendant)
  • 07/18/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0017144 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 07/14/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Result: Granted
  • 07/13/2017
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court)
  • 07/13/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Court; As to: Juan Carlos Palma (Plaintiff)
  • 07/13/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 05/22/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/22/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Juan Carlos Palma against Defendant Neftali Molina on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Juan Carlos Palma on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $10,000.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $10,000.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Neftali Molina. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 05/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Neftali Molina (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/09/2017
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Juan Carlos Palma (Plaintiff); As to: Neftali Molina (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --