HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2017 09:49:30

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ljiljana Mandic against Eva Bozulich Correa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2148
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mandic Ljiljana
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Correa Eva Bozulich Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Rejection]
5/1/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
5/1/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
5/9/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/05/2017
7/5/2017: Minute Order of 07/05/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 10/02/2017
  • 07/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 05/09/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Amount: $10.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0014244 (Check)
  • 05/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 05/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/05/2017
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/09/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 05/08/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Eva Bozulich Correa (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Eva Bozulich Correa (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/27/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ljiljana Mandic (Plaintiff); As to: Eva Bozulich Correa (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011473 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --