HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:16:19

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ljiliana Mandic against Eva Bozulich Correa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2145
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Michael J. Pearce
  • Courthouse

    Downey Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mandic Ljiliana
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Correa Eva Bozulich Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Other - (name extension) - QUALIFICATIONS OF A NON...
6/26/2017: Other - (name extension) - QUALIFICATIONS OF A NO...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
5/1/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/26/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/26/2017
6/26/2017: Minute Order of 06/26/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Other - QUALIFICATIONS OF A NONCERTIFIED OR NONREGISTERED INTERPRETER; Filed by: Non-Party
  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 06/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LJiliana Mandic on 03/01/2017: Defendant Eva Bozulich Correa does not owe the plaintiff LJiliana Mandic any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/26/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Eva Bozulich Correa (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 05/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 05/01/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Amount: $10.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0013938 (Check)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Eva Bozulich Correa (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/27/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LJiliana Mandic (Plaintiff); As to: Eva Bozulich Correa (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0011469 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --