HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:13:43

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by David Slavin against City Of Los Angeles in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2030
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Slavin David
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    City Of Los Angeles Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
4/14/2017: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/14/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/1/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by David Slavin on 03/01/2017, Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to City of Los Angeles
  • 04/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: David Slavin (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2017
  • 03/14/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/09/2017
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: David Slavin (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: David Slavin (Plaintiff)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: David Slavin (Plaintiff)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011040 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --