HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:13:29

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Anthony Rito Moriel against 5131 De Longpre Ave Llc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2026
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Moriel Anthony Rito
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    5131 De Longpre Ave Llc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgmen...
5/2/2017: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgmen...
  Fees Apply
Download
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ON REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMEN...
4/10/2017: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ON REQUEST TO PAY JUDGME...
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Pay Judgment to Court
4/10/2017: Request to Pay Judgment to Court
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR REQUEST FOR FUNDS
4/10/2017: NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR REQUEST FOR FUNDS
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds
6/1/2017: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • Transfer Amount = $205.40; Receipt # : STRM-2017-0000888-1; From : 17STSC02026; To :
  • 06/01/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: anthony Rito Moriel (Plaintiff)
  • 06/01/2017
  • Refund Requested - $205.40
  • 06/01/2017
  • Refund Approved - $205.40
  • 05/02/2017
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/02/2017 ; Status Date changed from 04/03/2017 to 05/02/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 04/10/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: 5131 De Longpre Ave LLC (Defendant)
  • 04/10/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Pay Jdgmt to Court Fee-Pmt of jdgmt to ct-CCP 116.860; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0012513 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/10/2017
  • Trust Deposit: Civil Trust Account; Amount: $205.40 Receipt: ST-2017-0012513 (Check); Party: 5131 De Longpre Ave LLC (Defendant)
  • 04/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ON REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR REQUEST FOR FUNDS; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 04/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff anthony Rito Moriel against Defendant 5131 De Longpre Ave LLC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by anthony Rito Moriel on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $175.00 and costs of $30.00 for a total of $205.00.
  • 04/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: 5131 De Longpre Ave LLC (Defendant)
  • 04/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/03/2017
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: anthony Rito Moriel (Plaintiff); As to: 5131 De Longpre Ave LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/23/2017
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: anthony Rito Moriel (Plaintiff); As to: 5131 De Longpre Ave LLC (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011032 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --