HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:16:03

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Erji Incorporated against Raymundo Sanchez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2024
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Sanchez Raymundo Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Erji Incorporated Dba Jalisco Building Supply
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/20/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 04/20/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/20/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Erji Incorporated on 03/01/2017: Defendant Raymundo Sanchez does not owe the plaintiff Erji Incorporated DBA Jalisco Building Supply any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Erji Incorporated (Plaintiff); As to: Raymundo Sanchez (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011028 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --