HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:13:19

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Joyce Y Lee against Na Young Oh in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2023
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Lee Bum Jai Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Lee Joyce Y
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Oh Na Young Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
3/13/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/14/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Joyce Y Lee (Plaintiff); Na Young Oh (Defendant); Bum Jai Lee (Defendant)
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joyce Y Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Na Young Oh (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/06/2017
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joyce Y Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Bum Jai Lee (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/08/2017
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Joyce Y Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Na Young Oh (Defendant); Bum Jai Lee (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011023 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Clerical Error on 03/01/2017

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --