HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:15:57

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Juan Verdin against Josselyn Merlos in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2021
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Merlos Josselyn Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Verdin Juan
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Verdin Juan Jr. - Junior
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/13/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/12/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Josselyn Merlos (Defendant)
  • 09/13/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: Juan Verdin, JR. - Junior (Plaintiff); As to: Josselyn Merlos (Defendant)
  • 06/12/2017
  • Address for Josselyn Merlos (Defendant) updated
  • 06/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/12/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/12/2017
  • 06/12/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/12/2017
  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 06/12/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Juan Verdin; Plaintiff Juan Verdin JR. - Junior against Defendant Josselyn Merlos on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Juan Verdin, et al. on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $2,550.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 06/12/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 11/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 05/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Juan Verdin (Plaintiff); Juan Verdin, JR. - Junior (Plaintiff); As to: Josselyn Merlos (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/19/17
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Party to 06/12/2017
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Juan Verdin (Plaintiff); Juan Verdin, JR. - Junior (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Juan Verdin (Plaintiff); Juan Verdin, JR. - Junior (Plaintiff); As to: Josselyn Merlos (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011019 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $3.00; Payment: 3.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011019 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --