HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:12:53

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Dale Asti Sipiceanu against Frank O Simon Mardell L Simon Simon Trustees in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1695
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Patricia J. Titus
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Cavoretto Successor Trustee Shan E. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Frank O. Simon & Mardell L. Simon Simon Trustees Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Sipiceanu Justin O.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Sipiceanu Dale Asti
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/10/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/3/2017: Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
6/1/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Dale Asti Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); Justin O. Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); As to: Frank O. Simon & Mardell L. Simon Simon Trustees (Defendant); Shan E. Cavoretto (Successor Trustee) (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 06/01/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/01/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/03/2017 to 06/01/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 06/01/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/01/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/01/2017 to 06/01/2017
  • 05/10/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 04:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 05/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Dale Asti Sipiceanu; Plaintiff Justin O. Sipiceanu against Defendant Frank O. Simon & Mardell L. Simon Simon Trustees Simon Trust; Defendant Shan E. Cavoretto (Successor Trustee) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dale Asti Sipiceanu, et al. on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $3,500.00 and costs of $250.00 for a total of $3,750.00, joint and several.
  • 05/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Frank O. Simon & Mardell L. Simon Simon Trustees (Defendant); Shan E. Cavoretto (Successor Trustee) (Defendant)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dale Asti Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); Justin O. Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); As to: Frank O. Simon & Mardell L. Simon Simon Trustees (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/05/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dale Asti Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); Justin O. Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); As to: Shan E. Cavoretto (Successor Trustee) (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/05/2017; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dale Asti Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); Justin O. Sipiceanu (Plaintiff); As to: Frank O. Simon & Mardell L. Simon Simon Trustees (Defendant); Shan E. Cavoretto (Successor Trustee) (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010242 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Patricia J. Titus at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 6
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 04:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 6
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010243 (Credit Card)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --