HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:15:29

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Chibuzo Walton against Obasi Obasi in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1692
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Obasi Obasi Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Walton Chibuzo
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - ( notice of entry of judgment )
5/24/2017: RETURNED MAIL - ( notice of entry of judgment )
  Free
Download
[Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]
6/7/2017: [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]
6/7/2017: [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/4/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/4/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)
6/7/2017: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
RETURNED MAIL - (Order on Request to Make Payments...
7/5/2017: RETURNED MAIL - (Order on Request to Make Payments...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) -...
6/28/2017: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/08/2017
5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Request to Make Payments)...
8/4/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Request to Make Payments)...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2017
  • Updated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Result: Withdrawn - Filed in Error
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Request to Make Payments)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Request to Make Payments) of 08/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Hearing on Request to Make Payments scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/04/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 08/04/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party
  • 07/05/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL (Order on Request to Make Payments); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Obasi Obasi (Defendant)
  • 06/28/2017
  • Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) [You must go to court if you want to be heard]. Signed and Filed by: As to: Obasi Obasi (Defendant)
  • 06/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) [You must go to court if you want to be heard].]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/07/2017
  • Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Obasi Obasi (Defendant)
  • 06/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/07/2017
  • Hearing on Request to Make Payments scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 05/24/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL ( notice of entry of judgment ); Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Chibuzo Walton against Defendant Obasi Obasi on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Chibuzo Walton on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $3,420.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $3,470.00.
  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/08/2017
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/08/2017; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --