HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:15:23

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Kamil Youssefzadeh against Jose Martin G Jimenez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1689
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Jimenez Jose Martin G. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Youssefzadeh Kamil
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/14/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
6/8/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
7/3/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017
8/1/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Affidavit (name extension) - OF UNSUCESSFUL SERVIC...
3/14/2017: Affidavit (name extension) - OF UNSUCESSFUL SERVI...
  Fees Apply
Download
Affidavit (name extension) - OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVI...
4/5/2017: Affidavit (name extension) - OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVI...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/1/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/01/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Kamil Youssefzadeh against Defendant Jose Martin G. Jimenez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kamil Youssefzadeh on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $0.00 and costs of $200.00 for a total of $200.00.
  • 08/01/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kamil Youssefzadeh (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Martin G. Jimenez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/20/2017; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 06/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/01/2017
  • 06/08/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Kamil Youssefzadeh (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/14/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Amount: $10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011884 (Cash)
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/08/2017
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 04/14/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 04/14/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Kamil Youssefzadeh (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/05/2017
  • Affidavit OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE; Filed by: Kamil Youssefzadeh (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Martin G. Jimenez (Defendant)
  • 03/14/2017
  • Affidavit OF UNSUCESSFUL SERVICE; Filed by: Kamil Youssefzadeh (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Martin G. Jimenez (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kamil Youssefzadeh (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Martin G. Jimenez (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010221 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010221 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --