HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:15:13

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Cesar Segovia Dds against Leeland Stephenson in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1682
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Segovia Dds Cesar
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Stephenson Leeland Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/12/2017: Minute Order of 05/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State B...
5/12/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/8/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/12/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Cesar Segovia DDS against Defendant Leeland Stephenson on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cesar Segovia DDS on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $3,500.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $3,600.00.
  • 05/12/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/12/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cesar Segovia DDS (Plaintiff); As to: Leeland Stephenson (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/07/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cesar Segovia DDS (Plaintiff); As to: Leeland Stephenson (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010203 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --