HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:12:11

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Cesar Segovia Dds against Tara Das in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1681
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Segovia Dds Cesar
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Das Tara Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State B...
5/12/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State ...
  Fees Apply
Download
RETURNED MAIL - - Minute Order Dated May 12, 2017
5/22/2017: RETURNED MAIL - - Minute Order Dated May 12, 2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/8/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/12/2017
5/12/2017: Minute Order of 05/12/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- RETURNED MAIL - Minute Order Dated May 12, 2017: As To Parties: Tara Das (Defendant)
  • 05/22/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL - Minute Order Dated May 12, 2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/12/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/12/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/12/2017
  • Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to court order
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cesar Segovia DDS (Plaintiff); As to: Tara Das (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/07/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cesar Segovia DDS (Plaintiff); As to: Tara Das (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010202 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --