This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 01:21:57 (UTC).

123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANG VS PERSSON, SONJA GUNILLA

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERSSON, SONJA GUNILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9334

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANGELES I LLC DBA 123 HOME CARE

3407 W. 6Th Street #709

Los Angeles, CA 90020

Defendant

PERSSON SONJA GUNILLA AKA LINVILLE SONJA

Pacific Palisa, CA 90272

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/26/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Graeme freeman, appearing.

6/3/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Graeme freeman, appearing.

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

6/3/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

7/27/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/27/2016

7/27/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/27/2016

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/03/2016

6/3/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/03/2016

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

6/1/2016: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketBench Warrant (Civil) ORAP; Filed by: Clerk; As to: SONJA GUNILLA PERSSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketBench Warrant - ORAP Issued on 08/16/2016; As to: PERSSON, SONJA GUNILLA ( Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 06/03/2016 to 07/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/27/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/27/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/27/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANGELES I, LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketCase reassigned to Hon. at in effective 06/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Graeme freeman, appearing. Filed by: (123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANGELES I, LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANGELES I, LLC) DBA (123 HOME CARE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 02:36P M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART, PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY GRAENA FREEMAN . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/29/16 . FOR (123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANGELES I, LLC) DBA (123 HOME CARE) . AGAINST (PERSSON, SONJA GUNILLA) AKA (LINVILLE, SONJA) . PRINCIPAL $ 5000.00 . COSTS $ 75.00 . TOTAL $ 5075.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (PERSSON, SONJA GUNILLA) AKA (LINVILLE, SONJA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 06/03/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketRECEIVED FEES FROM (123 HOME CARE SERVICES LOS ANGELES I, LLC) DBA (123 HOME CARE) IN THE SUM OF $ 6.75 FOR FAX FILING OF REQUEST TO POSTPONE . RECEIPT # ING208268008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (PERSSON, SONJA GUNILLA) AKA (LINVILLE, SONJA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/29/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 . COSTS OF $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1151217E3213. HEARING SET FOR 02/29/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less