Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2016 at 06:18:19 (UTC).

11651-11652 YORK AVENUE LLC VS. MEZA, IRENE

Case Summary

On 04/14/2016 11651-11652 YORK AVENUE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MEZA, IRENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1788

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

11651-11652 YORK AVENUE LLC

Defendant

MEZA IRENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP - TIFFANY D TRUONG

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (MEZA, IRENE) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 05/10/16 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/11/16 , FOR (11651-11652 YORK AVENUE LLC) , AGAINST (MEZA, IRENE) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 11652 YORK AVENUE #1 HAWTHORNE, CA 90250 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . PLACED IN THE ATTY'S BOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MEZA, IRENE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MEZA, IRENE) . BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • AFFIDAVIT OF (MEZA, IRENE) FILED RE: REASONABLE DILIGENCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MEZA, IRENE) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 05/10/16 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 33.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500862010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 10/11/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 11651-11652 YORK AVENUE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUONG TIFFANY D.