Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2019 at 09:59:30 (UTC).

1165-11652 YORK AVE VS. CERVANTES, JUAN

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 1165-11652 YORK AVE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CERVANTES, JUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1007

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NANCY NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1165-11652 YORK AVE LLC A CALIF. LTDLIAB. CO.

Defendant

CERVANTES JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK AND ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK ESQ

Attorney at DENNIS P. BLOCK AND ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/06/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (CERVANTES, JUAN) ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 11/12/14 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/13/14 , FOR (1165-11652 YORK AVE) LLC, A CALIF. LTD LIAB. CO. , AGAINST (CERVANTES, JUAN) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 11652 YORK AVE. #1 HAWTHORNE, CA 90250 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 29.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SM538975003 . ATTY BUX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL, DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT, AND WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED AS TO (1165-11652 YORK AVE) LLC, A CALIF. LTD LIAB. CO. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (1165-11652 YORK AVE) LLC, A CALIF. LTD LIAB. CO. FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - NO ANSWER ON FILE SUBMITTED ON 11/12/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CERVANTES, JUAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CERVANTES, JUAN) ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT OF (1165-11652 YORK AVE) LLC, A CALIF. LTD LIAB. CO. FILED RE: PURSUANT TO CCP 1169 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM519607014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/20/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE NANCY NEWMAN .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 11651-11652 YORK AVENUE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.