This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2016 at 05:24:32 (UTC).

1024 ROYAL OAKS LP VS. FRANCIS, WYNONA

Case Summary

On 03/04/2015 1024 ROYAL OAKS LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FRANCIS, WYNONA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1673

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1024 ROYAL OAKS LP DBA WHISPERING FOUNTAINS AT MONROVIA

Defendant

FRANCIS WYNONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - WILLIAM M. GARRETT, JR.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/01/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/03/15 , FOR (1024 ROYAL OAKS LP) DBA (WHISPERING FOUNTAINS AT MONROVIA) , AGAINST (FRANCIS, WYNONA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1024 ROYAL OAKS DRIVE #209 MONROVIA, CA 91016 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 26.83 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RETURNED TO ATTORNEY . RECEIPT # PAS416085004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FRANCIS, WYNONA) . COSTS OF $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FRANCIS, WYNONA) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS463601038.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE THOSE DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THIS CASE TO A FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY KEVIN C. BRAZILE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/29/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1024 ROYAL OAKS LP DBA WHISPERING FOUNTAINS AT MONROVIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARRETT, WILLIAM M.