This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2019 at 03:38:46 (UTC).

1024 ROYAL OAKS, LP VS CHRISTINE FUENTES

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 1024 ROYAL OAKS, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHRISTINE FUENTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2001

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1024 ROYAL OAKS LP DBA WHISPERING FOUNTAINS AT MONROVIA

Defendant

FUENTES CHRISTINE

Monrovia, CA 91016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT WILLIAM MILFORD JR

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

9/17/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Order (name extension) - on Findings and Order

9/5/2018: Order (name extension) - on Findings and Order

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

9/5/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/5/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

9/5/2018: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

8/14/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

8/15/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Answer

8/3/2018: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/3/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Application for Order to Post

7/23/2018: Application for Order to Post

Summons - on Complaint

7/13/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Christine Fuentes)

7/17/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Christine Fuentes)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

7/17/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Complaint

7/13/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/13/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

7/13/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/21/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: 1024 Royal Oaks, LP (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 26.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Order on Findings and Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Christine Fuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • Application for Order to Post; Signed and Filed by: 1024 Royal Oaks, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Application for Order to Post; Filed by: 1024 Royal Oaks, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 07/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: 1024 Royal Oaks, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Christine Fuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 1024 Royal Oaks, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1024 ROYAL OAKS LP DBA WHISPERING FOUNTAINS AT MONROVIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARRETT, WILLIAM M.