This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:44:23 (UTC).

ZIMMERMANN VS ZIMMERMANN

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 ZIMMERMANN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ZIMMERMANN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1917

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZIMMERMANN, TINA

Respondent

ZIMMERMANN, KENNETH M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: AMENDED RE: AMERICAN GENERAL MEDIA 401(K) PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 10/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: RE: AMERICAN GENERAL MEDIA 401(K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less