Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:28 (UTC).

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. VS MOORE

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MOORE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0956

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE

Defendant

MOORE, SHANICA S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: MOORE, SHANICA S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Returned via Effective Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Declaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via Effective Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Stipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: as to Any and All Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Stipulation for Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Shanica S. Moore. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Plaintiff: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE; Attorney: YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS; Defendant: MOORE, SHANICA S.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by Clerk as to Shanica Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 5904 Lisa Ct Bakersfield, CA 93304-7194

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Robert M Young Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less