This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/11/2020 at 18:31:28 (UTC).

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOMES VS LAMAX MARKETING INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC DBA EHOMES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAMAX MARKETING INC . This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0099

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOM

Defendants

LAMAX MARKETING INC.

LAMBERT, CHERYL LYNN

LAMBERT, JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE (SC-104)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO POSTPONE & PROOFS OF SERVICE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO SET TRIAL & PROOF OF SERVICE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO SET TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR JAMIE LAMBERT-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment for Cherly Lynn Lambert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of entry of judgment mail to LAMAX Marketing INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOM; Judgment Amount: $1,800.00; Awarded Against: LAMAX MARKETING INC.; LAMBERT, CHERYL LYNN; LAMBERT, JAMIE; Amount; Damages: $1,600.00; Costs: $200.00; Total: $1800.00; Party: Names: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOM; LAMAX MARKETING INC.; LAMBERT, CHERYL LYNN; LAMBERT, JAMIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR LAMAX MARKETING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR CHERYL LYNN LAMBERT-ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR JAMIE LAMBERT-ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: Judge Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: FOR CHERYL LAMBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: FOR LAMAX MARKETING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: FOR JAMIE LAMBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE (SC-104)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO POSTPONE & PROOFS OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO SET TRIAL & PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST TO SET TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less