This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:31 (UTC).

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIELD VS FLOREZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIELD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLOREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1441

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIELD

Defendants

FLOREZ, CAROLYN

FLOREZ, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIELD; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 9310 VIA LUGANO BAKERSFIELD, CA 93312-6652; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: FLOREZ, CAROLYN; FLOREZ, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: return Effective

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: CAROLYN FLOREZ & JOHN FLOREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: all unknown occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: CAROLYN FLOREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: JOHN FLOREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIELD; Unserved; Served: 03/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 9310 VIA LUGANO BAKERSFIELD, CA 93312-6652 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.