Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:33 (UTC).

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE VS LAND

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LAND. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0958

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE

Defendants

TESSEN, TODD

LAND, KRISTEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

10/7/15 Minute Order - Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15): Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Unlawful Detainer:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - 10/7/15 Minute Order - Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15): Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ZIMMERMAN REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA EHOMES OF BAKERSFIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 4404 Pebble Creeks Dr Apt D Bakersfield, CA 93312-5577

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Robert M Young Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less