This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 22:33:24 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS RICO-AVILA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICO-AVILA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Staley, H.A. "Skip", Camacho, Marcos R. and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0140

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Camacho, Marcos R.

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

RICO-AVILA, TERESA

RICO, SAIL

SHAIRET-RICO, KEILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TALMACHOFF, MARY K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY; Awarded Against: RICO-AVILA, TERESA; RICO, SAIL; SHAIRET-RICO, KEILA; Amount; Damages: $2,897.91; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $460.00; Total: $3357.91; Party: Names: ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY; RICO-AVILA, TERESA; RICO, SAIL; SHAIRET-RICO, KEILA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Comment: Total $3,357.91 As to Teresa Rico-Avila, Saul Rico and Keila Shairet-Rico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1 through 20 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: As to Keila Shairet-Rico, Teresa Rico-Avila and Saul Rico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Personal Service as to Keila Shairet-Rico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Substituted Service as to Saul Rico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Personal Service As to Teresa Rico-Avila

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY; Served: 10/26/2017; Served: 10/26/2017; Served: 10/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less