This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 07:21:52 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS RAMOS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R. and Foley, Therese M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0298

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Foley, Therese M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

RAMOS, JESSICA LUZBETH ESCOBEDO

RAMOS AUTO SALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORBIN, MICHAEL K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: - (DE-1) Jessica Luzbeth Escobedo Ramos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: (DE-2) Ramos Auto Sales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: (DE-1) Jessica Luzbeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketLetter Mailed - Comment: Re: Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY; Served: 10/21/2021; Served: 10/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAMOS AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant