This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:51:42 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS KERN COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KERN COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0592

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zenith Insurance Company

Defendants

Kern County Superintendent of Schools

Kern County Board of Education

Kern County Schools

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERN, RICHARD J

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/5/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Commencement of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Kern County Board of Education

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service - Kern County Schools

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service - Kern Co Superintendent of Schools

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/23/2017; Served: 03/23/2017; Served: 03/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/5/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.