Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 09:05:31 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS CHAVEZMACIAS

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHAVEZMACIAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0732

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CHAVEZMACIAS, GUSTAVO A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARBAGALLO, WILLIAM B.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/19/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15am Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Filing of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/19/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15am Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARBAGALLO, WILLIAM B.