This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:27 (UTC).

ZARAGOZA VS ZARAGOZA

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 ZARAGOZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ZARAGOZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZARAGOZA, ROBERT VICTOR

Respondent

ZARAGOZA, ALICIA TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARDINER, DONALD J.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

Ruling: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 02/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FL-300 FL-305 & FL-303

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 02/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.