This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 23:05:31 (UTC).

ZAMUDIO VS AEROTEK, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 ZAMUDIO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AEROTEK, INC , A MARYLAND CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S., Bradshaw, J. Eric and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2423

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMUDIO, DIANA VEGA

Defendants

AEROTEK, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION

CATERPILLAR INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AEROTEK INC

CATERPILLAR INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAIRAVI, EDWIN

Defendant Attorneys

KUN, MICHAEL S

ROSENMAN, ANDREW S.

FLORES, SEAN A.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/31/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Ruling

Ruling 11/19/2021: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/19/2021: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Caterpillar Inc., A Delaware Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Aerotek, Inc, A Maryland Corporation via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/19/20211:45 PM; Served: 10/19/20211:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/31/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUN MICHAEL STUART