This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 13:42:01 (UTC).

ZAMORA VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 ZAMORA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1726

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMORA, MAUREEN

Defendants

FCA US LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HADDAD DODGE/KIA, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

FCA US LLC

BAKERSFIELD DODGE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEELY, JOHN CONRAD

Defendant Attorney

HANSON, ERIN E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/12/21 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to FCA US LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/12/21 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSON ERIN E.