This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:55 (UTC).

Zalba VS Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 Zalba filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0481

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zalba, Ascension,

Defendants

Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company

Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross

Wellpoint, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELTZ, JULIA ZALBA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: Zalba, Ascension,; Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company; Wellpoint, Inc.; Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to entire action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/2/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less