This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:33 (UTC).

YORKE VS WEST COAST FIERO

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 YORKE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEST COAST FIERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Cervantes, Gina. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Cervantes, Gina

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YORKE, JEFF

Defendant

WEST COAST FIERO

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal After Mediation(CS); Party: Names: YORKE, JEFF; WEST COAST FIERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: YORKE, JEFF; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.