This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:27 (UTC).

YORK VS BAGLEY

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 YORK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BAGLEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******S395

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILLIP YORK, AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OF JANE MURDOCK

Defendants

BAGLEY, JOHN W

BAGLEY - IRVIN, SHARON

BAGLEY, JOHN W.

CO-ADMINISTRATROR OF THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA BAGLEY BYERS

CO-ADMINISTRATROR OF THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA BAGLEY

BAGLEY-IRVIN, SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BILHEIMER, JOHN G

Attorney at HALEY & BILHEIMER

MONTAGUE, JOHN D

HALEY, ALLAN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2013
  • Notice of Entry - Comment: OF ORDER FILED BY JOHN D. MONTAGUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • Order - Comment: FOLLOWING RE-HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IN CONNECTION WITH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT ISSUE ***ETIENNE***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • NP1835 - Comment: Department: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • NP1821 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO DECLARATION OF ABSENCE OF JOHN E. BAGLEY WHY TO ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 07/25/2013 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR THIS MINUTE ORDER AMENDED ON 9/9/2013 BY LKROLNIK TO CORRECT DEPARTMENT Upon rehearing requested by defendant, it is determined that defendant has failed in his burden of proving mistake, inadvertence, surprise or excusable neglect. (Code Civ. Proc. Sec. 704.790). The 6/07/2013 order following hearing on application for order for sale of dwelling shall remain in full force and effect. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to submit an order accordingly. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Reply - Comment: CLAIMANT AND JUDGMENT CREDITOR PHIL YORK, TRUSTEE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER RE: SALE OF DWELLING FILED BY JOHN D. MONTAGUE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Opposition - Comment: TO APPLICATION FOR ORDER REGARDING SALE OF DWELLING FILED BY STEVE KARCHER, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF JOHN W. BAGLEY, REGARDING ABSENCE AT HEARING OF JULY 10, 2013 [CCP 473. ET SEQ.] FILED BY STEVE KARCHER, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • NP1511 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO DECLARATION OF ABSENCE OF JOHN E. BAGLEY WHY TO ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY JOHN G BILHEIMER ON BEHALF OF PHILLIP YORK, AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OF JANE MURDOCK (PL-1). JOHN W. BAGLEY (DE-1) APPEARS BY STEVE KARCHER. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADINGS. MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO FAX DECLARATION OF JOHN BAGLEY AND OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO COUNSEL JOHN BILHEIMER BY NOON ON 07/25/2013, FAX NUMBER PROVIDED IN OPEN COURT. COUNSEL JOHN BILHEIMER TO FILE AND SERVE REPLY BY NOON ON 07/26/2013. CAUSE TO BE UNDER SUBMISSION AT THAT TIME. THE COURT WILL RULE ON THE PAPERS. CAUSE STANDS SUBMITTED. AS OF NOON ON 07/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • 4003 Order to Show Cause - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE:AS TO DECLARATION OF ABSENSE OF JOHN E. BAGLEY WHY TO ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLIONG ON 05/14/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: RE:AS TO DECLARATION OF ABSENSE OF JOHN E. BAGLEY WHY TO ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLIONG ON 05/14/13; Parties Present Plaintiff: PHILLIP YORK, AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OF JANE MURDOCK; Defendant: BAGLEY, JOHN W.; Defendant: BAGLEY, JOHN W.; Defendant: BAGLEY-IRVIN, SHARON

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: WHY AN ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOLD NOT ISSUE (NO PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OR POSTING AS OF 4/15/13 CCP 704.770(B)(2)); Parties Present Plaintiff: PHILLIP YORK, AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OF JANE MURDOCK; Defendant: BAGLEY, JOHN W.; Defendant: BAGLEY, JOHN W.; Defendant: BAGLEY-IRVIN, SHARON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: ON RIGHT TO HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION MAY 14, 2013 8:30A.M. KERN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, DEPT. 12, 1415 TRUXTUN AVE., BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: BY MAIL AS TO JOHN J. BURKE, JR. FILED BY JOHN D. MONTAGUE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Notice of Intent - Comment: TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY JOHN D. MONTAGUE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • 800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for PHILLIP YORK, AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESTATE OF JANE ... (PL-1). Received from MONTAGUE AND VIGLIONE, check no(s) 14564. Receipt #711566 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: WHY AN ODER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT ISSUE HEARING SET FOR MAY 4, 2013 AT 8:30A.M. IN DEPT. 12 **ETINNE** (SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • New Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JOHN D. MONTAGUE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Application - Comment: FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AND ISSANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT ISSUE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY JOHN D. MONTAGUE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less