This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/16/2020 at 09:43:59 (UTC).

YERRO VS ESTATE OF SUSANA A, DE LOS REYES

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 YERRO filed an Other lawsuit against ESTATE OF SUSANA A, DE LOS REYES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3235

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAGAL, BELLIE P.

YERRO, GLADYS HOPE D.

FRANCO, SENEN SIA

CALLAWAY, MARTINA V.

Defendants

THE TESTATE AND INTERSTATE SUCCESSORS OF SUSANA A. DE LOS REYES, DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT; ALL PERSONS CLAINING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN T

ESTATE OF SUSANA A, DE LOS REYES

THE TESTATE AND INTERSTATE SUCCESSORS OF SUSANA A. DE LOS REYES, DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT

ALL PERSONS CLAINING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB ILOULIAN

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Publication; lacking proper face page.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/2/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: **Hearing continued from 05/18/20 pursuant to Standing Order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: as to the Estate of Susana A. De Los Reyes; via The Daily Report, February 7th, 14th, 21st and the 28th.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Publication; lacking proper face page.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Publication of Summons - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Testate and Intestate Successors of Susana A De Los Reyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Publication of Summons - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Estate of Susana A De Los Reyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/07/2020; Served: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/2/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.