This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:05 (UTC).

YBARRONDO VS YBARRONDO

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 YBARRONDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against YBARRONDO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1924

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YBARRONDO, CARRIE P

Respondent

YBARRONDO, TOM V

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT RET'D TO PRO PER BIN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT RET'D TO PRO PER BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: 8/15/2018 ENDORSED COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 09/18/18 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less