This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:29:09 (UTC).

YATES VS YATES(B)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 YATES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against YATES B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4162

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YATES, ANTHONY

Respondent

YATES, JOANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 10/11/17 PET S/S PROP CONTRL JEWELRY; Parties Present Petitioner: YATES, ANTHONY; Respondent: YATES, JOANNA; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $495.00; Parties Present Petitioner: YATES, ANTHONY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 11/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 10/11/17 PET S/S PROP CONTRL JEWELRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: Arrangement TOTAL FEES $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REGARDING INPROPRIA PERSONA FILING/PLEADING BY THIRD PARTY LDA#137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less