Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 21:14:54 (UTC).

WYSINGER VS MORROW (C)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 WYSINGER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MORROW C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foley, Therese M., Gill, Susan M. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3363

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foley, Therese M.

Gill, Susan M.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WYSINGER, ASHLEY

Respondents

MORROW, ALEXANDER

MARROW, LOUIS ALEXANDER

MORROW, LOUIS ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Respondent Attorneys

FALK, STEPHANIE H

GARCIA, XOCHITL M

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DV110/DV116

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: 10/14/20 PET DV C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 11/02/20,05/26/21 T/E 3hrs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 10/14/20 PET DV C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT 2 MINORS ***STATUS: SCHOOL TIME VISITATION SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: HRG 06/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DV110/DV116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ENVELOPE #6640184

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/14/20 PET DV C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 11/02/20 5X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/14/20 PET DV C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 11/02/20 4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketObjections - Comment: E-FILED Objection To Request For Domestic Violence Restraining Order Based Upon Doctrine Of Res Judicata/Preclusion And Request To Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOrder on Peremptory Challenge-170.6 - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/14/20 PET DV C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Comment: 10/14/20 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: E-FILED; NEW GEORGE R . HORRIGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORRIGAN, GEORGE R