This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:07:54 (UTC).

WUO VS HOLZINGER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 WUO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOLZINGER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0223

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WUO, KATHY

Defendant

HOLZINGER, GINA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

Ruling 10/16/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: WUO, KATHY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 700 SO. SILVER RIDGE ST SPACE 49 RIDGECREST, CA 93555; Awarded Against: HOLZINGER, GINA; Party: Names: WUO, KATHY; HOLZINGER, GINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Ruling 10/16/2017:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 10/16/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WUO, KATHY; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.