This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 18:12:38 (UTC).

WONG VS DECKTER

Case Summary

On 01/13/2017 WONG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DECKTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0013

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONG, PATRICK

Defendant

DECKTER, JACOB

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: WONG, PATRICK; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1661 N BROWN ROAD, SPACE #35 INYOKERN, CA 93527; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: DECKTER, JACOB; Party: Names: WONG, PATRICK; DECKTER, JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: WONG, PATRICK; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less