This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 16:38:54 (UTC).

WONG VS BMK DEVELOPMENT, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2014 WONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMK DEVELOPMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3809

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANKLIN & CYNTHIA WONG, TRUSTEES FOR THE FRANKLIN WONG 1997 FAMILY LIMITED PART

WONG, KAREN S.

WONG, GORDON C.

WONG, GREGORY S.

WONG, MICHAEL C.

Defendants

BMK DEVELOPMENT, LLC

OLIVIA - 19TH STREET LLC

SOUTHWEST CONSULTING, INC.

MEO, BYRON A.

OLIVIA-19TH STREET LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TANAKA, CLAYTON T

Attorney at NEWMEYER & DILLION LLP

895 Dove St 5Fl

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

FLEWELLING, MARK T

CARR, CHRISTOPHER A

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO C.R.C. 3.1385; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T

Further Case Management Conference

CMC MO 08/02/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Defendant; Attorney: CARR, CHRISTOPHER A

Further Case Management Conference

05/31/16 MO - FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ANSWER OR DEFAULT NEEDS TO BE FILED PRIOR TO NEXT COURT DATE AS TO DEFENDANT - SOUTHWEST CONSULTING; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Public further cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 01/29/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T

Further Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/29/16: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T

Further Case Management Conference

cmc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 09/30/15; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T

Further Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference 9/30/15: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T

Case Management Conference

CV283809 MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T; Plaintiff; Attorney: TANAKA, CLAYTON T

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: pursuant to crc, rule 3.1385 re-set from 11/17/2016 (D-17 dark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: (cont'd from 10/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Dismissal entered November 09, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Comment: at order to show cause hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO C.R.C. 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment: ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY CLAYTON T. TANAKA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: BY MAIL OF RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS), FILED BY CLAYTON T TANAKA, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: CLAYTON T. TANAKA RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL BIN RE: WONG VS BMK DEVELOPMENT, LLC Case No. S-1500-CV-283809, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. SUMMONS IS NOT CONSISTENT WITH CAPTION ON COMPLAINT. ALL PARTY NAMES MUST MATCH ON SUMMONS, CAPTION ON COMPLAINT AND IN BODY OF COMPLAINT EXACTLY. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: CLAYTON T. TANAKA RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL BIN RE: WONG VS BMK DEVELOPMENT, LLC Case No. S-1500-CV-283809, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. SUMMONS IS NOT CONSISTENT WITH CAPTION ON COMPLAINT. ALL PARTY NAMES MUST MATCH ON SUMMONS, CAPTION ON COMPLAINT AND IN BODY OF COMPLAINT EXACTLY. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 05, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 05, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for FRANKLIN & CYNTHIA WONG, TRUSTEES FOR THE FRANK... (PL-1). Received from SAN LUIS OBISPO LEGAL SERVICES, check no(s) 15417. Receipt #816645 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY CLAYTON T. TANAKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY CLAYTON T. TANAKA CMC SET 7/1/15 @8:15AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.