This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 06:17:40 (UTC).

WOLLNER, Jr. ET AL VS CITY OF BAKERSFIELD ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 WOLLNER, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BAKERSFIELD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1416

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WOLLNER, ANDRE, Jr.

ANDRE WOLLNER GUARDIAN AND FATHER, AND PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF DECEDENT MYISHA SMITH

WOLLNER, ELAYA

ANDRE WOLLNER JR. AND ELAYA WOLLNER AS THE SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

COUNTY OF KERN

WILLIAMS, LAWRENCE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

JAMIRON ELLIS, A NOMINAL DEFENDANT AND MINOR

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (CALTRANS)

ELLIS, JAMIRON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRACHUK, THOMAS J.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

O'DELL, MICHAEL L

GIBBS, PATRICK J

LARSEN, BRIAN L.

BROWN, PAUL R.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Receipt & Acknowledgment: #1 is incomplete, a copy of the Order is not attached

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account for Elaya Laray Phontae Wollner and Andre Kingston Marcel Wollner Jr: ELECTRONIC FILING IS NOW MANDATORY IN KERN. RE-SUBMIT YOUR DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Petition to Approve Minors Compromise,[Proposed] Order Approving and [Proposed] Order to Deposit: Duplicate filings, Petition and Orders have been processed and/or signed. Order copies have been emailed to Thomas J Trachuk.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Petition to Approve Minors Compromise, [Proposed] Order Approving Comproise and [Proposed] Order to Deposit Money as to Jamiron Ellis: Claimant name is incorrect on Proposed Orders, resubmit Petition with proposed orders.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Petition to Approve Minors Compromise,[Proposed] Order Approving and [Proposed] Order to Deposit: Incorrect case number on all documents also when filing out fill in forms make sure to click finalize to remove prompts from page.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Order Approving Compromise as to Elaya Wollner: Please review your scanned document. You have 2 of page 4 attached. (1 with the inocrrect D.O.B for Claimant)

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: *Petition to Approve Compromise, [Proposed] Order to Deposit Money and [Proposed] Order Approving Compromise as to Andre Wollner Jr. *Petition to Approve Compromise and [Proposed] Order to Deposit Money as to Elaya Wollner- Incorrect page size selected when submitted and additional pages attached to document. ****Accepted in error filer has resubmitted documents.****

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Minor's Compromise/Orders: Claimants name is spelled incorrectly

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Petitions for Minors Compromise/Letter:All documents must be filed seperately. You are submitting 4 different documents as one. Your letter requests a hearing to be continued, no action will be taken. Any request moving a hearing must be submitted with a proposed order and has a $20 fee.

Ruling

Ruling 01/24/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 09/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 07/19/2018, Defendant/ Cross- Complainant/Cross-Defendant, Lawrence Williams, Motion to Compel Jamiron Ellis' Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set One), ResID: 31566

Petition

Petition 02/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/9/2018 PETITIONER/DEFENDANT JAMIRON ELLIS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT ResID: 28792; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BROWN, PAUL R.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Defendant; Attorney: O'DELL, MICHAEL L; Cross Complainant; Attorney: O'DELL, MICHAEL L; Defendant; Attorney: BROWN, PAUL R.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: O'DELL, MICHAEL L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MISSING FIRST TIME FILING FEE OF $435. PETITION, DECLARATION, POINTS & AUTHORITIES, AND PROPOSED ORDER

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Plaintiff; Attorney: TRACHUK, THOMAS J.; Defendant; Attorney: O'DELL, MICHAEL L; Cross Complainant; Attorney: O'DELL, MICHAEL L; Defendant; Attorney: BROWN, PAUL R.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS. GUARDIAN AD LITEM APP IS MISSING.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Receipt & Acknowledgment: #1 is incomplete, a copy of the Order is not attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: ***AMENDED*** as to Jamiron Ellis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Re: Receipt and acknowledgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account as to Elaya Wollner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account as to Andre Wollner Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account for Elaya Laray Phontae Wollner and Andre Kingston Marcel Wollner Jr: ELECTRONIC FILING IS NOW MANDATORY IN KERN. RE-SUBMIT YOUR DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: 3.1385 as to Cross-Complaint filed by JAMIRON ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: as to Cross Complaint filed by Jamiron Ellis With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO LAWRENCE WILLIAMS, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: THE COURT FINDS that it Is reasonable and necessary to appoint a guardian ad Iltem for the person named in Item 3 of the application, as requested. COURT ORDERS that (name): Andre Wollner Is hereby appointed as the guardian ad litem for (name): Andre Wollner, Jr. and Elaya Wollner, for the reasons set forth In Item 5 of the application. ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****8/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/29/2017; Served: 09/01/2017; Served: 09/21/2017; Served: 09/21/2017; Served: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS. GUARDIAN AD LITEM APP IS MISSING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/6/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less