This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:52:21 (UTC).

WOLFE VS WOLFE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 WOLFE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WOLFE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0240

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WOLFE, MATTHEW

Respondent

WOLFE, BRITANNIE

 

Court Documents

Court Trial

Court Trial 05/08/18: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 05/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Court Trial

Court Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: WOLFE, MATTHEW; Respondent: WOLFE, BRITANNIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Party: Names: WOLFE, MATTHEW; WOLFE, BRITANNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 05/08/18: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfirmation of Special Setting - Confirmation of Special Setting 05/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketAt Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less