This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 15:34:48 (UTC).

WITTY JACKSON VS JACKSON

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 WITTY JACKSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JACKSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0318

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WITTY JACKSON, GRACE ANNE

Respondent

JACKSON, PATRICK STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 10/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: I&E submitted with default indicates improved financial status; Parties Present Petitioner: WITTY JACKSON, GRACE ANNE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/17/2016: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: WITTY JACKSON, GRACE ANNE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 10/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: I&E submitted with default indicates improved financial status; Parties Present Petitioner: WITTY JACKSON, GRACE ANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice To Appear For Reconsideration Of Fee Waiver (FW-011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.