This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:02 (UTC).

WISE VS VAZQUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 WISE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0708

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WISE, DENISE

Defendants

VAZQUEZ, AZUCENA

ORTEGA, RAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, JOHN C

Defendant Attorney

LARRIVEE, OLIVER J

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less