This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 00:15:56 (UTC).

WINSLOW ET AL VS LENNAR FRESNO INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2015 WINSLOW filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LENNAR FRESNO INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Somers, John S. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4733

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Somers, John S.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WINSLOW, KASSIDY

BAUER - WINSLOW, COURTNEY

BAUER-WINSLOW, COURTNEY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LENNAR FRESNO INC.

NAGEL, SANDRA LOU

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC.

KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

SAFETY NETWORK INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LENNAR CORPORATION

NAGEL, SANDRA LOU

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

LENNAR FRESNO INC

KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SAFETY NETWORK, INC.

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WINSLOW, KASSIDY

NAGEL, SANDRA LOU

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

LENNAR FRESNO, INC

LENNAR FRESNO INC

KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

SAFETY NETWORK, INC.

LENNAR FRESNO, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G

Attorney at MARDEROSIAN RUNYON CERCONE

1260 Fulton Mall

Fresno, CA 93721

SCHONBUCH, MICHAEL

PARK, GORDON M

PEPEK, MICHAEL JOSEPH, Esquire

O'DELL, MICHAEL L

CLARKE, KEVIN M

THELEN, KEVIN E

ZIMMERMAN, BRIAN F

MA, FRANCES

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SCHONBUCH, MICHAEL

PARK, GORDON M

PEPEK, MICHAEL JOSEPH, Esquire

CLARKE, KEVIN M

THELEN, KEVIN E

ZIMMERMAN, BRIAN F

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment 02/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/22/16 Defendants/Cross-Complianants/Cross-Defendants, LENNAR FRESNO, INC. and LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC. Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication on the Issue of Punitive Damages ResID: 19387; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, KEVIN E; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PARK, GORDON M

Mandatory Settlement Conference

02/10/2017 Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 10 DAYS FCMC 3-03-17 / TD 3-13-17; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, KEVIN E; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PARK, GORDON M

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 02/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/02/2017 Defendant/Cross-Complainant/Cross-Defendant, Lennar Fresno, Inc. and Lennar Homes of California, Inc. Application for Motion to Continue Trial, or in the alternative, for an Order Shortening Time to Hear the Motion to Continue Trial; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, KEVIN E; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PARK, GORDON M

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

01/18/2017 Minute Order: Ex Parte on App for Order Shortening Time for Motion for Mental Status Exam: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/17/2017 Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Kern Pacific Construction Company Application for an order shortening time for hearing on Motion for an Order for Mental Status Examination; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, KEVIN E

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

01/18/2017 Minute Order: Ex Parte on Application for Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/17/2017 Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Safety Network, Inc. Application for Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, KEVIN E

Motion to Strike

06/27/16 MO ; Defendant's Motion to Strike: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/20/16 Defendants and Cross-Complainants/Cross-Defendants, LENNAR FRESNO INC. and LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC. Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint ResID: 16084 ******************************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION TO STRIKE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. TWENTY (20) DAYS TO SERVE AND FILE AMENDED PLEADING. ***************************************************; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, KEVIN E

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

5/3/16 MO: Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/29/2016 Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Lennar Fresno, Inc. and Lennar Homes of California, Inc. Application continuing the trial date and all related law and motion and discovery cut-off dates pursuant to the parties' stipulation; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, KEVIN E

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

4/15/16 MO: Motion to Amend: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/17/16 Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant, KASSIDY WINSLOW and Plaintiff, COURTNEY BAUER-WINSLOW Motion to Amend Complaint to Add a Request for Punitive Damages against Defendants Lennar Fresno Inc and Lennar Homes of California Inc. ResID: 15536 ******************************************************* MOTION IS MOOT. PARTIES ARE STIPULATING TO LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. ************************************************; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: MARDEROSIAN, MICHAEL G

Case Management Conference

Minute Order - CMC - 01/26/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: As to the cross comaplaint of City of Bakersfield, with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: pursuant to crc, rule 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: As to cross-complaint of Lennar Fresno Inc. only, with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to croos-complaint of Lennar Homes of California, Inc. only, with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to cross-complaint filed by Kern Pacific Construction Company only, with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Time estimate: 10 days (Old TD 1-30-17)

    Read MoreRead Less
173 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: of Lennar Corporation Filed by Kevin M. Clarke Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: (Defendant Lennar Corporation) Filed by Kevin M. Clarke Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Lennar Corporation by personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Lennar Fresno INC. by personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Sandra Lou Nagel by substituted service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 14, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 14, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: ADD THE PARTY ~ calid=2853981 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:10/14/2015, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, SystemDate:5/4/2015 12:39:12 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL G. MARDEROSIAN, ESQ; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 1/26/2016 8:00 A.M. DEPARTMENT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY NETWORK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lennar Fresno, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNAR CORPORATION is a litigant