This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 09:06:21 (UTC).

WINDERMERE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION VS RICHARDSON

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 WINDERMERE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICHARDSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1635

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINDERMERE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendant

RICHARDSON, KYLE G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONJE, RICHARD A

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Kyle Richardson Document: Certificate of Inability to Respond Does not conform to Rule 2.100-2.119, California Rules of Court, as form and format. Defendants address is missing. Attach proof of service on opposing party.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Extension granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: Filed by Kyle Richardson, In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Kyle Richardson Document: Certificate of Inability to Respond Does not conform to Rule 2.100-2.119, California Rules of Court, as form and format. Defendants address is missing. Attach proof of service on opposing party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO KYLE G RICHARDSON, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MISC. ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/1/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCertificate - Comment: Regarding alternative dispute resolution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONJE, RICHARD A